Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 841 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (100-38) | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (34-13) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Floor Amendment {123521/1 (Senator Folden) Rejected (15-30) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Floor Amendment {273024/1 (Senator Mautz) Rejected (14-32) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Floor Amendment {853222/1 (Senator McKay) Rejected (14-32) | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Motion Special Order until 3/6 (Senator Folden) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Committee Amendment Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {323226/1 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | First Reading Finance |