House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |