Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {293827/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |