House | 04/01/2024 | Withdrawn by Sponsor | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-1) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/31/2024 | First Reading Finance |