Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB745 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22
33 EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW.
44 [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law.
55 *sb0745*
66
77 SENATE BILL 745
88 F2 4lr2328
99
1010 By: Senator Jennings
1111 Introduced and read first time: February 1, 2024
1212 Assigned to: Education, Energy, and the Environment
1313
1414 A BILL ENTITLED
1515
1616 AN ACT concerning 1
1717
1818 Virginia–Maryland College of Veterinary Medicine – Funding 2
1919
2020 FOR the purpose of increasing the number of Maryland residents in the student body of 3
2121 the Virginia–Maryland College of Veterinary Medicine, contingent on certain 4
2222 agreements; and generally relating to the Virginia–Maryland College of Veterinary 5
2323 Medicine. 6
2424
2525 BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 7
2626 Article – Education 8
2727 Section 13–801 through 13–803 9
2828 Annotated Code of Maryland 10
2929 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 11
3030
3131 BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 12
3232 Article – Education 13
3333 Section 13–804 14
3434 Annotated Code of Maryland 15
3535 (2022 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16
3636
3737 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 17
3838 That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 18
3939
4040 Article – Education 19
4141
4242 13–801. 20
4343
4444 (a) In this subtitle the following words have the meanings indicated. 21
4545
4646 (b) “Board” means the Budget and Program Review Board. 22
4747 2 SENATE BILL 745
4848
4949
5050 (c) “College” means the Virginia–Maryland [Regional] College of Veterinary 1
5151 Medicine. 2
5252
5353 13–802. 3
5454
5555 (a) There is a Virginia–Maryland [Regional] College of Veterinary Medicine. 4
5656
5757 (b) In addition to the provisions of this subtitle the College is subject to the 5
5858 provisions of Title 11 (Maryland Higher Education Commission) of this article. 6
5959
6060 (c) The College shall be operated under the terms and conditions agreed to in: 7
6161
6262 (1) The Agreement of Regional Cooperation between the State of Maryland 8
6363 and the Commonwealth of Virginia, dated February 14, 1980; and 9
6464
6565 (2) The Agreement between Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State 10
6666 University and the University of Maryland, College Park Campus for a regional program 11
6767 in veterinary medical education, dated September 27, 1989. 12
6868
6969 (d) The College shall be operated as one school with an administrative head at 13
7070 each university. 14
7171
7272 (e) The student body of the College shall consist of 50 Virginia residents, [30] 42 15
7373 Maryland residents, and 10 at–large. 16
7474
7575 13–803. 17
7676
7777 (a) There is a Budget and Program Review Board. 18
7878
7979 (b) The Board is responsible for determining annually the resource needs of the 19
8080 professional instructional program of the College. 20
8181
8282 (c) The Board shall consist of the following seven members: 21
8383
8484 (1) The Dean of the Virginia–Maryland [Regional] College of Veterinary 22
8585 Medicine, who shall serve as Chairman of the Board; 23
8686
8787 (2) The Dean of the College of Agriculture and Natural Resources of the 24
8888 University of Maryland, College Park Campus; 25
8989
9090 (3) The Senior Vice President and Provost of the Virginia Polytechnic 26
9191 Institute and State University; 27
9292
9393 (4) The Vice President and Provost of the University of Maryland, College 28
9494 Park Campus; 29
9595
9696 (5) The Executive Vice President and Chief Business Officer of the Virginia 30 SENATE BILL 745 3
9797
9898
9999 Polytechnic Institute and State University; 1
100100
101101 (6) An appointee of the President of the Virginia Polytechnic Institute and 2
102102 State University; and 3
103103
104104 (7) The Vice Chancellor for Administration and Finance of the University 4
105105 System of Maryland or the Vice Chancellor’s successor. 5
106106
107107 (d) The Board shall: 6
108108
109109 (1) Determine the cost share for each state; 7
110110
111111 (2) Set the proportion of costs to be funded by tuition; and 8
112112
113113 (3) Periodically review and adjust the building use fees charged to the 9
114114 students of the College. 10
115115
116116 (e) The appropriate fiscal support staff of each university, which shall include the 11
117117 Vice Chancellor for Administration and Finance of the University System of Maryland, 12
118118 shall provide fiscal support to the Board. 13
119119
120120 13–804. 14
121121
122122 (a) To calculate the actual costs of the professional instructional program of the 15
123123 College, costs associated with graduate education, continuing education, the agricultural 16
124124 experiment stations, cooperative extension services, and expenditures associated with 17
125125 contractual grant research shall be excluded. 18
126126
127127 (b) The Executive Vice President and Chief Business Officer of the Virginia 19
128128 Polytechnic Institute and State University shall be responsible for providing the Board with 20
129129 the cost data on which the actual costs of the professional instructional program of the 21
130130 College shall be determined after consulting with the fiscal support staff of the Virginia 22
131131 Polytechnic Institute and State University and the University of Maryland, College Park 23
132132 Campus. 24
133133
134134 (c) To determine the appropriate level of general fund contributions for meeting 25
135135 the actual costs of the professional instructional program of the College to be requested 26
136136 from the executives and legislatures of the State of Maryland and the Commonwealth of 27
137137 Virginia, respectively, revenues estimated to be generated by tuition fees and charges, 28
138138 appropriate federal funds, instructional fees, and other instructional sources of income 29
139139 shall be subtracted from the calculations. 30
140140
141141 (d) The State of Maryland shall provide the appropriate level of general funds to 31
142142 meet the financial requirements of the professional instructional program of the College. 32
143143
144144 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That : 33
145145 4 SENATE BILL 745
146146
147147
148148 (a) This Act may not take effect until the Commonwealth of Virginia concurs with 1
149149 revisions, in accordance with § 13–802(e) of the Education Article, as enacted by Section 1 2
150150 of this Act, to the terms and conditions agreed to in: 3
151151
152152 (1) the Agreement of Regional Cooperation between the State of Maryland 4
153153 and the Commonwealth of Virginia, dated February 14, 1980; and 5
154154
155155 (2) the Agreement between Virginia Polytechnic Institute and State 6
156156 University and the University of Maryland, College Park Campus for a regional program 7
157157 in veterinary medical education, dated September 27, 1989. 8
158158
159159 (b) The Department of Legislative Services shall notify the appropriate officials 9
160160 of the Commonwealth of Virginia of the enactment of this Act. 10
161161
162162 (c) On or before July 1, 2024, the Dean of the College of Agriculture and Natural 11
163163 Resources of the University of Maryland, College Park Campus shall request a 12
164164 determination letter from the Executive Vice President and Provost of the Virginia 13
165165 Polytechnic Institute and State University confirming the concurrence of the revisions 14
166166 described in subsection (a) of this section. 15
167167
168168 (d) Within 5 days after receiving the determination letter requested under 16
169169 subsection (c) of this section from the Executive Vice President and Provost of the Virginia 17
170170 Polytechnic Institute and State University, the Dean of the College of Agriculture and 18
171171 Natural Resources of the University of Maryland, College Park Campus shall forward a 19
172172 copy of the letter to the Department of Legislative Services. 20
173173
174174 SECTION 3. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That , subject to Section 2 of this 21
175175 Act, this Act shall take effect June 1, 2024. 22