Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 499 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Floor Amendment {623829/1 (Delegate Healey) Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {983623/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |