Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {273627/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/23 at 9:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |