Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 438 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation |