Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 144 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {813628/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |