Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 436 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {443920/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {703123/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |