Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (101-36)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Floor Amendment {323527/1 (Delegate Wilson) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {233123/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rereferred to Economic Matters
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (45-1)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {443427/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Budget and Taxation
|
|
|