House
|
03/28/2024
|
Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (28-17)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Floor Amendment {303322/1 (Senator Carozza) Rejected (16-25)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Hershey) Rejected (16-27)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Floor Amendment {303322/1 (Senator Carozza)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Floor Amendment {333121/1 (Senator Ready) Rejected (14-30)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Guzzone) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Floor Amendment {333121/1 (Senator Ready)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {143625/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Ready) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator West) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {143625/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2024
|
First Reading Budget and Taxation
|
|
|