Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 610 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {893520/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |