Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 987 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (129-6) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |