Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 871 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (140-0) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {233027/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {783124/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Finance |