Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 284 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (132-5) | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Finance |