Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 681 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (133-1) | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |