Senate | 04/08/2024 | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Guzzone) Adopted | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-0) | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {503629/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/06/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/28/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {583025/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |