Senate | 04/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 10 | ||
Senate | 03/28/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/02/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 02/01/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Floor Amendment {553025/1 (Senator Gile) Adopted | ||
Senate | 01/30/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {433524/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 01/29/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | Hearing 1/18 at 3:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/12/2024 | Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 09/15/2023 | Pre-filed |