House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/08/2024 | Referred Judiciary | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {543529/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 11/01/2023 | Pre-filed |