Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 995 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Economic Matters | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {353526/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Hearing 2/23 at 10:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 10/12/2023 | Pre-filed |