Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 929
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (32-13)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2024
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (108-31)
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {933123/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2024
|
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Floor Amendment {693026/1 (Judicial Proceedings Committee) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Favorable Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Folden) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/15 (Senator Smith) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
|
|
|