House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (44-0) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Floor Amendment {923525/1 (Senator Augustine) Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {793622/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |