House | 03/18/2024 | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {763229/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/11/2024 | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 10/26/2023 | Pre-filed |