Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB91 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/14/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
         Underlining indicates amendments to bill. 
         Strike out indicates matter stricken from the bill by amendment or deleted from the law by 
amendment. 
          *sb0091*  
  
SENATE BILL 91 
K3   	4lr1177 
  	(PRE–FILED) 	CF HB 11 
By: Senator McCray 
Requested: October 26, 2023 
Introduced and read first time: January 10, 2024 
Assigned to: Finance 
Committee Report: Favorable with amendments 
Senate action: Adopted 
Read second time: February 29, 2024 
 
CHAPTER ______ 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Workforce Development and Adult Learning – Leasing Training Program – 2 
Establishment 3 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Leasing Training Program in the Maryland 4 
Department of Labor to train, prepare, and connect job seekers with careers in the 5 
residential rental housing industry; requiring the Division of Workforce 6 
Development and Adult Learning to administer the Program and award grants to 7 
certain designated partnerships; establishing the Leasing Training Program Fund 8 
as a special, nonlapsing fund; requiring interest earnings of the Fund to be credited 9 
to the Fund; and generally relating to the Leasing Training Program. 10 
 
BY adding to 11 
 Article – Labor and Employment 12 
Section 11–1601 through 11–1606 to be under the new subtitle “Subtitle 16. Leasing 13 
Training Program” 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2016 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 17 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 18 
Section 6–226(a)(2)(i) 19 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 20 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 21 
  2 	SENATE BILL 91  
 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, with amendments, 1 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 2 
Section 6–226(a)(2)(ii)189. and 190. 3 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 4 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 5 
 
BY adding to 6 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 7 
Section 6–226(a)(2)(ii)191. 8 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 9 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 10 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 11 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 12 
 
Article – Labor and Employment 13 
 
SUBTITLE 16. LEASING TRAINING PROGRAM. 14 
 
11–1601. 15 
 
 (A) IN THIS SUBTITLE THE FOLLOWING WORD S HAVE THE MEANINGS 16 
INDICATED. 17 
 
 (B) “DESIGNATED PARTNERSHI P” MEANS A PARTNERSHIP BETWEEN 18 
ORGANIZATIONS , INCLUDING EMPLOYERS , TRADE ASSOCIATIONS , LOCAL BOARDS , 19 
NONPROFIT ORGANIZATI ONS, AND OTHER RELEVANT O RGANIZATIONS , THAT TRAIN 20 
AND CONNECT JOB SEEK ERS WITH CAREERS AS LEAS ING PROFESSIONALS IN THE 21 
RESIDENTIAL RENTAL H OUSING INDUSTRY IN T HE STATE. 22 
 
 (C) “DIVISION” MEANS THE DIVISION OF WORKFORCE DEVELOPMENT AND 23 
ADULT LEARNING. 24 
 
 (D) “FUND” MEANS THE LEASING TRAINING PROGRAM FUND. 25 
 
 (E) “PROGRAM” MEANS THE LEASING TRAINING PROGRAM. 26 
 
11–1602. 27 
 
 (A) THERE IS A LEASING TRAINING PROGRAM IN THE DEPARTMENT . 28 
 
 (B) THE DIVISION SHALL ADMINI STER THE PROGRAM. 29 
 
 (C) THE DIVISION MAY ADOPT RE GULATIONS TO CARRY O UT THE 30 
PROGRAM. 31   	SENATE BILL 91 	3 
 
 
 
11–1603.  1 
 
 THE PURPOSE OF THE PROGRAM IS TO TRAIN, PREPARE, AND CONNECT JOB 2 
SEEKERS WITH CAREERS IN THE RESIDENTIAL R ENTAL HOUSING INDUST RY IN THE 3 
STATE. 4 
 
11–1604. 5 
 
 (A) SUBJECT TO THE LIMITA TIONS OF THE STATE BUDGET , THE DIVISION 6 
SHALL AWARD GRANTS O N A COMPETITIVE BASI S TO ELIGIBLE DESIGN ATED 7 
PARTNERSHIPS THAT : 8 
 
 (1) TRAIN AND CONNECT JO B SEEKERS WITH CAREE RS AS LEASING 9 
PROFESSIONALS IN THE RESIDENTIAL RENTAL H OUSING INDUSTRY IN T HE STATE; 10 
AND 11 
 
 (2) HAVE EXPERIENCE TRAI NING AND CONNECTING JOB SEEKERS 12 
WITH CAREERS AS LEAS ING PROFESSIONALS WI TH LANDLORDS THAT : 13 
 
 (I) MANAGE MORE THAN 100 RESIDENTIAL RENTAL U NITS IN 14 
THE STATE; AND 15 
 
 (II) MANAGE RESIDENTIAL R ENTAL UNITS IN MULTI PLE 16 
COUNTIES. 17 
 
 (B) (1) THE DIVISION ANNUALLY SHA LL AWARD $250,000 IN GRANTS TO 18 
ELIGIBLE DESIGNATED PARTNERSHIPS . 19 
 
 (2) THE DIVISION MAY AWARD A GRANT OF UP TO $250,000 EACH 20 
YEAR TO A SINGLE ELI GIBLE DESIGNATED PAR TNERSHIP. 21 
 
11–1605. 22 
 
 (A) THERE IS A LEASING TRAINING PROGRAM FUND. 23 
 
 (B) THE PURPOSE OF THE FUND IS TO PROVIDE FU NDING FOR THE 24 
PROGRAM. 25 
 
 (C) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL ADMINISTER THE FUND. 26 
 
 (D) (1) THE FUND IS A SPECIAL , NONLAPSING FUND THAT IS NOT 27 
SUBJECT TO § 7–302 OF THE STATE FINANCE AND PROCUREMENT ARTICLE. 28 
  4 	SENATE BILL 91  
 
 
 (2) THE STATE TREASURER SHALL HOLD THE FUND SEPARATELY , 1 
AND THE COMPTROLLER SHALL ACC OUNT FOR THE FUND. 2 
 
 (E) THE FUND CONSISTS OF : 3 
 
 (1) MONEY APPROPRIATED I N THE STATE BUDGET TO THE FUND;  4 
 
 (2) INTEREST EARNINGS ; AND 5 
 
 (3) FUNDS FROM ANY OTHER SOURCE ACCEPTED FOR THE BENEFIT 6 
OF THE FUND. 7 
 
 (F) THE FUND MAY BE USED ONLY TO SUPPORT THE PURPO SES OF THE 8 
PROGRAM. 9 
 
 (G) (1) THE STATE TREASURER SHALL INVES T MONEY IN THE FUND IN 10 
THE SAME MANNER AS O THER STATE MONEY MAY BE IN VESTED. 11 
 
 (2) ANY INVESTMENT EARNIN GS OF THE FUND SHALL BE PAID IN TO 12 
THE FUND. 13 
 
 (H) EXPENDITURES FROM THE FUND MAY BE MADE ONLY IN ACCORDANCE 14 
WITH THE STATE BUDGET . 15 
 
 (I) FOR EACH OF FISCAL YE ARS 2026, 2027, AND 2028, THE GOVERNOR 16 
SHALL MAY INCLUDE IN THE ANNUA L BUDGET BILL AN APP ROPRIATION TO THE 17 
FUND OF $250,000 TO SUPPORT THE PROGRAM. 18 
 
11–1606. 19 
 
 ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1 EACH YEAR, BEGINNING IN 2026, THE DIVISION 20 
SHALL REPORT TO THE GOVERNOR AND , IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 2–1257 OF THE 21 
STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY ON THE NUMBE R OF JOB 22 
SEEKERS THAT : 23 
 
 (1) RECEIVED TRAINING UN DER THE PROGRAM; 24 
 
 (2) COMPLETED THE TRAINI NG OFFERED THROUGH THE PROGRAM; 25 
AND 26 
 
 (3) RECEIVED EMPLOYMENT OFFERS AS A RESULT O F PARTICIPATING 27 
IN THE PROGRAM. 28 
 
Article – State Finance and Procurement 29 
   	SENATE BILL 91 	5 
 
 
6–226. 1 
 
 (a) (2) (i) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, and unless 2 
inconsistent with a federal law, grant agreement, or other federal requirement or with the 3 
terms of a gift or settlement agreement, net interest on all State money allocated by the 4 
State Treasurer under this section to special funds or accounts, and otherwise entitled to 5 
receive interest earnings, as accounted for by the Comptroller, shall accrue to the General 6 
Fund of the State. 7 
 
 (ii) The provisions of subparagraph (i) of this paragraph do not apply 8 
to the following funds: 9 
 
 189. the Teacher Retention and Development Fund; [and] 10 
 
 190. the Protecting Against Hate Crimes Grant Fund; AND 11 
 
 191. THE LEASING TRAINING PROGRAM FUND. 12 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 13 
October 1, 2024. 14 
 
 
 
Approved: 
________________________________________________________________________________  
 Governor. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
         President of the Senate. 
________________________________________________________________________________  
  Speaker of the House of Delegates.