Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 621 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-2) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 03/01/2024 | Third Reading Passed (39-5) | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {663527/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Motion Laid Over (Senator Hershey) Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {663527/1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 2/16 at 9:00 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |