House | 04/04/2024 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |