Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB935 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/06/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0935*  
  
SENATE BILL 935 
M5, P2   	4lr2906 
    	CF 4lr2959 
By: Senator Gallion 
Introduced and read first time: February 2, 2024 
Assigned to: Education, Energy, and the Environment 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Department of General Services – Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program – 2 
Establishment 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of General Services, in consultation with the 4 
Public Service Commission, to establish a Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program in 5 
the Department on or before a certain date; requiring the Department, in 6 
consultation with the Commission, to issue a certain solicitation for a renewable 7 
natural gas contract; authorizing the Department to enter into a contract to procure 8 
renewable natural gas; requiring the Department to collect certain data, require the 9 
completion of certain lifecycle analyses, and analyze certain economic costs and 10 
benefits; and generally relating to the Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program. 11 
 
BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 12 
 Article – Public Utilities 13 
Section 7–704.4(a)(1) and (3) 14 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 15 
 (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16 
 
BY adding to 17 
 Article – State Finance and Procurement 18 
Section 4–325 and 4–326 to be under the new part “Part IV. State Purchase of 19 
Energy” 20 
Annotated Code of Maryland 21 
 (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 22 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 23 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 24 
 
Article – Public Utilities 25 
 
7–704.4. 26  2 	SENATE BILL 935  
 
 
 
 (a) (1) In this section the following words have the meanings indicated. 1 
 
 (3) “Social cost of greenhouse gases” means the most recent social cost of 2 
greenhouse gases adopted by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. 3 
 
Article – State Finance and Procurement 4 
 
4–323. RESERVED. 5 
 
4–324. RESERVED. 6 
 
PART IV. STATE PURCHASE OF ENERGY. 7 
 
4–325. 8 
 
 (A) IN THIS PART THE FOLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 9 
INDICATED. 10 
 
 (B) “PROGRAM” MEANS THE RENEWABLE NATURAL GAS PILOT PROGRAM. 11 
 
 (C) “SOCIAL COST OF GREENH OUSE GASES” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN § 12 
7–704.4 OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 13 
 
4–326. 14 
 
 (A) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2025, THE DEPARTMENT , IN 15 
CONSULTATION WITH TH E PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION, SHALL ESTABLISH A 16 
RENEWABLE NATURAL GAS PILOT PROGRAM IN THE DEPARTMENT . 17 
 
 (B) THE PURPOSE OF THE PROGRAM IS TO PROCURE RENEWABLE NA TURAL 18 
GAS FOR USE AS A FUE L IN THE STATE’S TRANSPORTATION AND B UILDING SECTORS 19 
TO EVALUATE THE ECONOMI C BENEFITS AND COSTS OF REPLACING FOSSIL 20 
NATURAL GAS WITH REN EWABLE NATURAL GAS , ON A SHORT –TERM AND  21 
LONG–TERM BASIS, IN FURTHERANCE OF TH E STATE’S NET–ZERO STATEWIDE 22 
GREENHOUSE GAS EMISS IONS REDUCTION GOALS. 23 
 
 (C) (1) UNDER THE PROGRAM, THE DEPARTMENT , IN CONSULTATION 24 
WITH THE PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION: 25 
 
 (I) SHALL ISSUE A COMPETITIVE SEALED PROCUREMENT 26 
SOLICITATION FOR RENEWABLE NATURA L GAS; AND 27 
   	SENATE BILL 935 	3 
 
 
 (II) MAY ENTER INTO AT LE AST ONE CONTRACT TO PROCURE 1 
RENEWABLE NATURAL GA S. 2 
 
 (2) WHEN ISSUING THE INVIT ATION FOR BIDS UNDER THIS 3 
SUBSECTION, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL TAKE INTO CONSIDERAT ION: 4 
 
 (I) THE COST –EFFECTIVENESS OF THE ADOPTION OF 5 
RENEWABLE NATURAL GA S; 6 
 
 (II) THE SOCIAL COST OF GREENHOUSE GASES ; AND 7 
 
 (III) THE STATE’S CLIMATE COMMITMENT S UNDER § 2–1204.2 8 
OF THE ENVIRONMENT ARTICLE. 9 
 
 (3) (I) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN SUBPARAGRAPH (II) OF THIS 10 
PARAGRAPH , RENEWABLE NATURAL GA S PROCURED THROUGH A CONTRACT UNDER 11 
PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION S HALL BE GENERATED IN THE STATE. 12 
 
 (II) IF SUFFICIENT RENEWABL E NATURAL GAS GENERA TED IN 13 
THE STATE IS NOT REASONABLY AV AILABLE FOR THE PROGRAM, THE STATE MAY 14 
PROCURE RENEWABLE NATURAL GAS FROM SOURCES OUTSIDE THE STATE. 15 
 
 (D) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 16 
 
 (1) COLLECT GREENHOUSE G AS EMISSIONS REDUCTI ON DATA THAT 17 
DETERMINES WHETHER RENEWABLE NA TURAL GAS MAY SUPPOR T THE STATE’S 18 
CLIMATE COMMITMENTS UNDER § 2–1204.2 OF THE ENVIRONMENT ARTICLE; 19 
 
 (2) REQUIRE THE GENERATOR OR OTH ER APPROPRIATE ENTIT Y OF 20 
RENEWABLE NATURAL GA S PROCURED UNDER THE PROGRAM TO COMPLETE A 21 
CARBON LIFECY CLE ANALYSIS THROUGH AN INDEPENDENT , THIRD–PARTY 22 
CONTRACTOR ; AND 23 
 
 (3) ANALYZE THE ECONOMIC BENEFIT S AND COSTS OF EXPANDING 24 
THE USE OF RENEWABLE NATURAL GAS IN THE TRANSPORTATION AND B UILDING 25 
SECTORS IN THE STATE. 26 
 
 (E) THE PROGRAM SHALL TERMINA TE ON DECEMBER 31, 2027. 27 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 28 
October 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 3 years and 9 months and, at the 29 
end of June 30, 2028, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, 30 
shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 31