1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. |
---|
4 | 4 | | [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. |
---|
5 | 5 | | *sb0935* |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | SENATE BILL 935 |
---|
8 | 8 | | M5, P2 4lr2906 |
---|
9 | 9 | | CF 4lr2959 |
---|
10 | 10 | | By: Senator Gallion |
---|
11 | 11 | | Introduced and read first time: February 2, 2024 |
---|
12 | 12 | | Assigned to: Education, Energy, and the Environment |
---|
13 | 13 | | |
---|
14 | 14 | | A BILL ENTITLED |
---|
15 | 15 | | |
---|
16 | 16 | | AN ACT concerning 1 |
---|
17 | 17 | | |
---|
18 | 18 | | Department of General Services – Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program – 2 |
---|
19 | 19 | | Establishment 3 |
---|
20 | 20 | | |
---|
21 | 21 | | FOR the purpose of requiring the Department of General Services, in consultation with the 4 |
---|
22 | 22 | | Public Service Commission, to establish a Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program in 5 |
---|
23 | 23 | | the Department on or before a certain date; requiring the Department, in 6 |
---|
24 | 24 | | consultation with the Commission, to issue a certain solicitation for a renewable 7 |
---|
25 | 25 | | natural gas contract; authorizing the Department to enter into a contract to procure 8 |
---|
26 | 26 | | renewable natural gas; requiring the Department to collect certain data, require the 9 |
---|
27 | 27 | | completion of certain lifecycle analyses, and analyze certain economic costs and 10 |
---|
28 | 28 | | benefits; and generally relating to the Renewable Natural Gas Pilot Program. 11 |
---|
29 | 29 | | |
---|
30 | 30 | | BY repealing and reenacting, without amendments, 12 |
---|
31 | 31 | | Article – Public Utilities 13 |
---|
32 | 32 | | Section 7–704.4(a)(1) and (3) 14 |
---|
33 | 33 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 15 |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2020 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 16 |
---|
35 | 35 | | |
---|
36 | 36 | | BY adding to 17 |
---|
37 | 37 | | Article – State Finance and Procurement 18 |
---|
38 | 38 | | Section 4–325 and 4–326 to be under the new part “Part IV. State Purchase of 19 |
---|
39 | 39 | | Energy” 20 |
---|
40 | 40 | | Annotated Code of Maryland 21 |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2021 Replacement Volume and 2023 Supplement) 22 |
---|
42 | 42 | | |
---|
43 | 43 | | SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 23 |
---|
44 | 44 | | That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 24 |
---|
45 | 45 | | |
---|
46 | 46 | | Article – Public Utilities 25 |
---|
47 | 47 | | |
---|
48 | 48 | | 7–704.4. 26 2 SENATE BILL 935 |
---|
49 | 49 | | |
---|
50 | 50 | | |
---|
51 | 51 | | |
---|
52 | 52 | | (a) (1) In this section the following words have the meanings indicated. 1 |
---|
53 | 53 | | |
---|
54 | 54 | | (3) “Social cost of greenhouse gases” means the most recent social cost of 2 |
---|
55 | 55 | | greenhouse gases adopted by the U.S. Environmental Protection Agency. 3 |
---|
56 | 56 | | |
---|
57 | 57 | | Article – State Finance and Procurement 4 |
---|
58 | 58 | | |
---|
59 | 59 | | 4–323. RESERVED. 5 |
---|
60 | 60 | | |
---|
61 | 61 | | 4–324. RESERVED. 6 |
---|
62 | 62 | | |
---|
63 | 63 | | PART IV. STATE PURCHASE OF ENERGY. 7 |
---|
64 | 64 | | |
---|
65 | 65 | | 4–325. 8 |
---|
66 | 66 | | |
---|
67 | 67 | | (A) IN THIS PART THE FOLLOWING WORDS HAVE THE MEANINGS 9 |
---|
68 | 68 | | INDICATED. 10 |
---|
69 | 69 | | |
---|
70 | 70 | | (B) “PROGRAM” MEANS THE RENEWABLE NATURAL GAS PILOT PROGRAM. 11 |
---|
71 | 71 | | |
---|
72 | 72 | | (C) “SOCIAL COST OF GREENH OUSE GASES” HAS THE MEANING STAT ED IN § 12 |
---|
73 | 73 | | 7–704.4 OF THE PUBLIC UTILITIES ARTICLE. 13 |
---|
74 | 74 | | |
---|
75 | 75 | | 4–326. 14 |
---|
76 | 76 | | |
---|
77 | 77 | | (A) ON OR BEFORE JANUARY 1, 2025, THE DEPARTMENT , IN 15 |
---|
78 | 78 | | CONSULTATION WITH TH E PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION, SHALL ESTABLISH A 16 |
---|
79 | 79 | | RENEWABLE NATURAL GAS PILOT PROGRAM IN THE DEPARTMENT . 17 |
---|
80 | 80 | | |
---|
81 | 81 | | (B) THE PURPOSE OF THE PROGRAM IS TO PROCURE RENEWABLE NA TURAL 18 |
---|
82 | 82 | | GAS FOR USE AS A FUE L IN THE STATE’S TRANSPORTATION AND B UILDING SECTORS 19 |
---|
83 | 83 | | TO EVALUATE THE ECONOMI C BENEFITS AND COSTS OF REPLACING FOSSIL 20 |
---|
84 | 84 | | NATURAL GAS WITH REN EWABLE NATURAL GAS , ON A SHORT –TERM AND 21 |
---|
85 | 85 | | LONG–TERM BASIS, IN FURTHERANCE OF TH E STATE’S NET–ZERO STATEWIDE 22 |
---|
86 | 86 | | GREENHOUSE GAS EMISS IONS REDUCTION GOALS. 23 |
---|
87 | 87 | | |
---|
88 | 88 | | (C) (1) UNDER THE PROGRAM, THE DEPARTMENT , IN CONSULTATION 24 |
---|
89 | 89 | | WITH THE PUBLIC SERVICE COMMISSION: 25 |
---|
90 | 90 | | |
---|
91 | 91 | | (I) SHALL ISSUE A COMPETITIVE SEALED PROCUREMENT 26 |
---|
92 | 92 | | SOLICITATION FOR RENEWABLE NATURA L GAS; AND 27 |
---|
93 | 93 | | SENATE BILL 935 3 |
---|
94 | 94 | | |
---|
95 | 95 | | |
---|
96 | 96 | | (II) MAY ENTER INTO AT LE AST ONE CONTRACT TO PROCURE 1 |
---|
97 | 97 | | RENEWABLE NATURAL GA S. 2 |
---|
98 | 98 | | |
---|
99 | 99 | | (2) WHEN ISSUING THE INVIT ATION FOR BIDS UNDER THIS 3 |
---|
100 | 100 | | SUBSECTION, THE DEPARTMENT SHALL TAKE INTO CONSIDERAT ION: 4 |
---|
101 | 101 | | |
---|
102 | 102 | | (I) THE COST –EFFECTIVENESS OF THE ADOPTION OF 5 |
---|
103 | 103 | | RENEWABLE NATURAL GA S; 6 |
---|
104 | 104 | | |
---|
105 | 105 | | (II) THE SOCIAL COST OF GREENHOUSE GASES ; AND 7 |
---|
106 | 106 | | |
---|
107 | 107 | | (III) THE STATE’S CLIMATE COMMITMENT S UNDER § 2–1204.2 8 |
---|
108 | 108 | | OF THE ENVIRONMENT ARTICLE. 9 |
---|
109 | 109 | | |
---|
110 | 110 | | (3) (I) EXCEPT AS PROVIDED IN SUBPARAGRAPH (II) OF THIS 10 |
---|
111 | 111 | | PARAGRAPH , RENEWABLE NATURAL GA S PROCURED THROUGH A CONTRACT UNDER 11 |
---|
112 | 112 | | PARAGRAPH (1) OF THIS SUBSECTION S HALL BE GENERATED IN THE STATE. 12 |
---|
113 | 113 | | |
---|
114 | 114 | | (II) IF SUFFICIENT RENEWABL E NATURAL GAS GENERA TED IN 13 |
---|
115 | 115 | | THE STATE IS NOT REASONABLY AV AILABLE FOR THE PROGRAM, THE STATE MAY 14 |
---|
116 | 116 | | PROCURE RENEWABLE NATURAL GAS FROM SOURCES OUTSIDE THE STATE. 15 |
---|
117 | 117 | | |
---|
118 | 118 | | (D) THE DEPARTMENT SHALL : 16 |
---|
119 | 119 | | |
---|
120 | 120 | | (1) COLLECT GREENHOUSE G AS EMISSIONS REDUCTI ON DATA THAT 17 |
---|
121 | 121 | | DETERMINES WHETHER RENEWABLE NA TURAL GAS MAY SUPPOR T THE STATE’S 18 |
---|
122 | 122 | | CLIMATE COMMITMENTS UNDER § 2–1204.2 OF THE ENVIRONMENT ARTICLE; 19 |
---|
123 | 123 | | |
---|
124 | 124 | | (2) REQUIRE THE GENERATOR OR OTH ER APPROPRIATE ENTIT Y OF 20 |
---|
125 | 125 | | RENEWABLE NATURAL GA S PROCURED UNDER THE PROGRAM TO COMPLETE A 21 |
---|
126 | 126 | | CARBON LIFECY CLE ANALYSIS THROUGH AN INDEPENDENT , THIRD–PARTY 22 |
---|
127 | 127 | | CONTRACTOR ; AND 23 |
---|
128 | 128 | | |
---|
129 | 129 | | (3) ANALYZE THE ECONOMIC BENEFIT S AND COSTS OF EXPANDING 24 |
---|
130 | 130 | | THE USE OF RENEWABLE NATURAL GAS IN THE TRANSPORTATION AND B UILDING 25 |
---|
131 | 131 | | SECTORS IN THE STATE. 26 |
---|
132 | 132 | | |
---|
133 | 133 | | (E) THE PROGRAM SHALL TERMINA TE ON DECEMBER 31, 2027. 27 |
---|
134 | 134 | | |
---|
135 | 135 | | SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect 28 |
---|
136 | 136 | | October 1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 3 years and 9 months and, at the 29 |
---|
137 | 137 | | end of June 30, 2028, this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, 30 |
---|
138 | 138 | | shall be abrogated and of no further force and effect. 31 |
---|