Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 227 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (124-11) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Rereferred to Ways and Means and Appropriations | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Referred Rules and Executive Nominations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {513625/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Energy, and the Environment) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment and Judicial Proceedings |