Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 932 | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Third Reading Passed (43-2) | ||
Senate | 04/05/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (123-16) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {933623/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {613429/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Finance and Judicial Proceedings |