Maryland 2024 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB945 Introduced / Bill

Filed 02/06/2024

                     
 
EXPLANATION: CAPITALS INDICATE MAT TER ADDED TO EXISTIN G LAW. 
        [Brackets] indicate matter deleted from existing law. 
          *sb0945*  
  
SENATE BILL 945 
J5, J1   	4lr0687 
    	CF 4lr0688 
By: Senator Kelly 
Introduced and read first time: February 2, 2024 
Assigned to: Finance 
 
A BILL ENTITLED 
 
AN ACT concerning 1 
 
Maryland Medical Assistance Program and Health Insurance โ€“ Individuals With 2 
Intellectual Disabilities โ€“ Study 3 
 
FOR the purpose of requiring the Maryland Department of Health and the Maryland 4 
Insurance Administration jointly to conduct a study of Maryland Medical 5 
Assistance Program and commercial health insurance coverage to measure the 6 
number and percentage of individuals who have been denied health coverage for 7 
the treatment of an intellectual disability during a certain period of time; and 8 
generally relating to a study of health coverage for individuals with intellectual 9 
disabilities.  10 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND	, 11 
That: 12 
 
 (a) The Maryland Department of Health and the Maryland Insurance 13 
Administration jointly shall conduct a study of Maryland Medical Assistance Program 14 
and commercial health insurance coverage to measure the number and percentage of 15 
individuals who have been denied health coverage for the treatment of an intellectual 16 
disability from July 1, 2022, to June 30, 2025, both inclusive. 17 
 
 (b) On or before December 1, 2025, the Maryland Department of Health and the 18 
Maryland Insurance Administration jointly shall report their findings to the Governor 19 
and, in accordance with ยง 2โ€“1257 of the State Government Article, the General Assembly.  20 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take effect July 21 
1, 2024. 22