Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 839 | ||
Senate | 04/09/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {993122/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {963027/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/09/2024 | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Finance |