Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 557
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (40-5)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (104-32)
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {563825/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2024
|
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (43-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Floor Amendment {693827/1 (Senator Hester) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {183320/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|