Senate | 05/09/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 474 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (101-35) | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {733920/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Hearing 3/12 at 1:15 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/16/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |