Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 174 | ||
Senate | 04/03/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/15/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment |