Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 559
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (100-37)
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2024
|
Floor Amendment {223320/1 (Delegate Love) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 4/01 (Delegate Stein) Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {723820/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2024
|
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
House
|
03/19/2024
|
Referred Environment and Transportation
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Floor Amendment {243025/1 (Senator Elfreth) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/18 (Senator Hester) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {123023/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2024
|
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Hearing canceled
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
|
|
|