Senate | 04/25/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 136 | ||
Senate | 04/04/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {623627/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/22 at 8:30 a.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |