Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 790 | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Passed Enrolled | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 04/08/2024 | Senate Concurs House Amendments | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Third Reading Passed (135-2) | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {693927/1 Adopted | ||
House | 04/05/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/20/2024 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/14/2024 | Referred Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/08/2024 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Budget and Taxation |