Senate
|
05/16/2024
|
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 768
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Passed Enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (33-12)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Senate Concurs House Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (100-35)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Floor Amendment {363426/1 (Delegate Miller) Rejected (37-96)
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {503623/1 Adopted
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Rereferred to Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2024
|
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2024
|
Third Reading Passed (35-12)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Floor Amendment {473629/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/03/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {153922/1 Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 4/2 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2024
|
Committee Amendment {153922/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments {153922/1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Motion Special Order until 3/19 (Senator Beidle) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Motion Laid Over (Senator Kelly) Adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2024
|
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2024
|
First Reading Finance
|
|
|