House | 03/21/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/01/2024 | Referred Environment and Transportation | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {703724/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 01/15/2024 | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 01/10/2024 | First Reading Finance | ||
Senate | 09/27/2023 | Pre-filed |