Maryland 2024 Regular Session

Maryland Senate Bill SB991 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 05/23/2024

                             	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 867 
 
– 1 – 
Chapter 867 
(Senate Bill 991) 
 
AN ACT concerning 
 
Behavioral Health – Language Assistance Services Pilot Program 
 
FOR the purpose of establishing the Language Assistance Services Pilot Program in the 
Behavioral Health Administration to provide grants to local behavioral health 
authorities to reimburse behavioral health providers for language assistance 
services for certain children, parents, and legal guardians; and generally relating to 
the Language Assistance Services Pilot Program. 
 
BY adding to 
 Article – Health – General 
Section 10–929 to be under the new part “Part V. Language Assistance Services Pilot 
Program” 
 Annotated Code of Maryland 
 (2023 Replacement Volume) 
 
 SECTION 1. BE IT ENACTED BY THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY OF MARYLAND, 
That the Laws of Maryland read as follows: 
 
Article – Health – General 
 
10–927. RESERVED. 
 
10–928. RESERVED.  
 
PART V. LANGUAGE ASSISTANCE SERVICES PILOT PROGRAM. 
 
10–929. 
 
 (A) IN THIS SECTION , “PROGRAM” MEANS THE LANGUAGE ASSISTANCE 
SERVICES PILOT PROGRAM. 
 
 (B) THERE IS A LANGUAGE ASSISTANCE SERVICES PILOT PROGRAM. 
 
 (C) THE PURPOSE OF THE PROGRAM IS TO: 
 
 (1) PROVIDE MEANINGFUL AC CESS TO BEHAVIORAL H EALTH CARE 
TO CHILDREN WITH LIM ITED ENGLISH PROFI CIENCY; AND 
 
 (2) ESTABLISH A COMPETITI VE GRANT PROCESS FOR LOCAL 
BEHAVIORAL HEALTH AU THORITIES TO PROVIDE REIMBURSEMENT TO BEH AVIORAL  Ch. 867 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 2 – 
HEALTH PROVIDERS FOR LANGUAGE ASSISTANCE SERVICES, INCLUDING 
INTERPRETATION AND T RANSLATION SERVICES TO: 
 
 (I) CHILDREN WITH LIMITED ENGLISH PROFICIENCY 
ACCESSING AND RECEIV ING BEHAVIORAL HEALT H SERVICES; AND 
 
 (II) PARENTS AND LEGAL GUA RDIANS COORDINATING THE 
PROVISION OF BEHAVIO RAL HEALTH SERVICES AND MAKING HEALTH CA RE 
DECISIONS REGARDING THE SERVICES ON BEHA LF OF A CHILD.  
 
 (D) THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL ADMINISTER THE PROGRAM. 
 
 (E) ON OR BEFORE OCTOBER 1, 2024, THE THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL 
ADOPT REGULATIONS TO IMPLEMENT AND ADMINISTER THE PROGRAM, INCLUDING 
REGULATIONS THAT EST ABLISH THE FOLLOWING THE FOLLOWING REQUIREMEN TS 
AS PART OF ADMINISTE RING THE PROGRAM: 
 
 (1) A REQUIREMENT THAT A G RANTEE DOCUMENT AND REPORT: 
 
 (I) THE NUMBER OF CHILDRE N WHO RECEIVED LANGU AGE 
ASSISTANCE SERVICES BROKEN DOWN BY PRIMA RY LANGUAGE SPOKEN ; 
 
 (II) THE NUMBER OF PARENTS AND LEGAL GU ARDIANS WHO 
RECEIVED LANGUAGE AS SISTANCE SERVICES BR OKEN DOWN BY PRIMARY 
LANGUAGE SPOKEN ; AND 
 
 (III) THE NUMBER OF LANGUAG E ASSISTANCE SERVICE S THAT 
WERE REIMBURSED BROK EN DOWN BY THE TYPE OF BEHAVIORAL HEALTH SERVICE 
PROVIDED; AND 
 
 (2) A REQUIREMENT THAT , TO REQUEST AND RECEI VE A 
REIMBURSEMENT FROM A PROGRAM GRANTEE , A HEALTH CARE PROVID ER MUST: 
 
 (I) BE A LICENSED AND ACC REDITED BEHAVIORAL H EALTH 
PROVIDER; AND 
 
 (II) HAVE A CURRENT , WRITTEN LANGUAGE ACC ESS PLAN 
DEMONSTRATING H OW THE PROVIDER ENSU RES MEANINGFUL ACCES S TO ITS 
PROGRAMS AND ACTIVIT IES FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH LIMITED ENGLISH 
PROFICIENCY.  
 
 (F) THE LANGUAGE ACCESS P LAN REQUIRED UNDER S UBSECTION (E)(2)(II) 
OF THIS SECTION SHAL L:   	WES MOORE, Governor 	Ch. 867 
 
– 3 – 
 
 (1) BE PROVIDED TO THE GR ANTEE IN ADDI TION TO ANY REQUEST 
FOR REIMBURSEMENT FO R LANGUAGE ASSISTANC E SERVICES; AND 
 
 (2) INCLUDE: 
 
 (I) A SELF–ASSESSMENT OF THE CI RCUMSTANCES UNDER 
WHICH THE PROVIDER M AY ENCOUNTER AN INDI VIDUAL WITH LIMITED ENGLISH 
PROFICIENCY; 
 
 (II) A SELF–ASSESSMENT OF THE NUMBER OR PROPOR TION OF 
INDIVIDUALS WITH LIM ITED ENGLISH PROFICIENCY F ROM EACH LANGUAGE GR OUP 
IN THE PROVIDER ’S SERVICE AREA TO DE TERMINE APPROPRIATE LANGUAGE 
ASSISTANCE SERVICES ; 
 
 (III) THE PROVIDER ’S PROCEDURE FOR IDEN TIFYING AN 
INDIVIDUAL’S PRIMARY LANGUAGE ; 
 
 (IV) THE PROVIDER ’S PROCEDURE FOR PROV IDING LANGUAGE 
ASSISTANCE SERVICES , INCLUDING ORAL AND W RITTEN LANGUAGE ASSI STANCE 
SERVICES; 
 
 (V) THE PROVIDER ’S PROCEDURE FOR ENSU RING EFFECTIVE 
COMMUNICATION WITH I NDIVIDUALS WITH LIMI TED ENGLISH PROFICIENCY IN 
LANGUAGES ENCOUNTERE D LESS FREQUENTLY ; 
 
 (VI) THE PROVIDER ’S PLAN FOR TRAINING STAFF ON THE 
PROVIDER’S POLICIES AND PROCE DURES; AND 
 
 (VII) THE PROVIDER ’S PROCEDURE FOR PROV IDING NOTICE OF 
LANGUAGE ASSISTANCE SERVICES AT NO COST TO INDIVIDUALS WITH LIM ITED 
ENGLISH PROFICIENCY . 
 
 (G) FOR EACH OF FISCAL YE ARS 2025 AND 2026, THE GOVERNOR SHALL 
INCLUDE IN THE ANNUA L BUDGET BILL AN APP ROPRIATION OF $120,000 TO THE 
PROGRAM. 
 
 (H) THE ADMINISTRATION SHALL AWARD, AT A MINIMUM , THREE GRANTS 
OF $30,000 EACH IN EACH OF FISC AL YEARS 2025 AND 2026. 
 
 (I) ON OR BEFORE DECEMBER 1, 2025, 2026, AND 2027, THE 
ADMINISTRATION SHALL SUBMIT TO THE GOVERNOR AND , IN ACCORDANCE WITH § 
2–1257 OF THE STATE GOVERNMENT ARTICLE, THE GENERAL ASSEMBLY A REPORT 
ON THE IMPLEMENTATION OF THE PROGRAM THAT INCLUDES :  Ch. 867 	2024 LAWS OF MARYLAND  
 
– 4 – 
 
 (1) THE TOTAL NUMBER OF I NDIVIDUALS WITH LIMI TED ENGLISH 
PROFICIENCY WHO RECE IVED LANGUAGE ASSIST ANCE SERVICES BROKEN DOWN BY 
JURISDICTION; 
 
 (2) THE TOTAL NUMBER OF C HILDREN WHO RECEIVED LANGUAGE 
ASSISTANCE SERVICES BROKEN D OWN BY PRIMARY LANGU AGE SPOKEN; 
 
 (3) THE TOTAL NUMBER OF P ARENTS AND LEGAL GUA RDIANS WHO 
RECEIVED LANGUAGE AS SISTANCE SERVICES BR OKEN DOWN BY PRIMARY 
LANGUAGE SPOKEN ; 
 
 (4) THE TOTAL NUMBER OF L ANGUAGE ASSISTANCE S ERVICES THAT 
WERE REIMBURSED BROKEN DO WN BY THE TYPE OF BE HAVIORAL HEALTH SERV ICE 
PROVIDED; AND 
 
 (5) THE TOTAL AMOUNT IN G RANT MONEY PROVIDED TO EACH 
GRANTEE DURING THE I MMEDIATELY PRECEDING FISCAL YEAR. 
 
 SECTION 2. AND BE IT FURTHER ENACTED, That this Act shall take eff ect July 
1, 2024. It shall remain effective for a period of 4 years and, at the end of June 30, 2028, 
this Act, with no further action required by the General Assembly, shall be abrogated and 
of no further force and effect. 
 
Approved by the Governor, May 16, 2024.