Senate | 05/16/2024 | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 819 | ||
Senate | 04/01/2024 | Returned Passed | ||
House | 03/29/2024 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Adopted | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/19/2024 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/16/2024 | Referred Health and Government Operations | ||
Senate | 03/15/2024 | Third Reading Passed (45-0) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments {633524/1 Adopted | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 02/02/2024 | First Reading Finance |