House | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/05/2025 | Third Reading Passed (42-0) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/18/2025 | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (139-0) | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {533828/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |