House | 04/07/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/07/2025 | Third Reading Passed (35-12) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Floor Amendment {873227/1 (Senator Folden) Rejected (12-31) | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Motion Special Order until Next Session (Senator Folden) Adopted | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Favorable | ||
Senate | 04/04/2025 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/20/2025 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (103-36) | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {583824/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | ||
House | 03/08/2025 | Hearing 3/10 at 11:30 a.m. | ||
House | 03/08/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Hearing 3/10 at 11:00 a.m. | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Hearing 3/06 at 2:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/12/2025 | Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |