Senate | 03/19/2025 | Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (103-35) | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {413820/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | First Reading Judiciary |