House | 04/01/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 03/31/2025 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | ||
Senate | 03/25/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 03/24/2025 | Favorable Report by Finance | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Finance | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (136-0) | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {883829/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/14/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 02/07/2025 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |