Senate | 03/19/2025 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
Senate | 03/17/2025 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 03/17/2025 | Third Reading Passed (106-33) | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Floor Amendment {403822/1 (Delegate Holmes) Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Pippy) Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Favorable with Amendments {333421/1 Adopted | ||
House | 03/15/2025 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 03/04/2025 | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 03/03/2025 | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 02/25/2025 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |