House | 04/02/2025 | Returned Passed | ||
Senate | 04/02/2025 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | ||
Senate | 03/27/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2025 | Referred Judicial Proceedings | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Third Reading Passed (137-0) | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:30 p.m. | ||
House | 01/15/2025 | Hearing canceled | ||
House | 01/08/2025 | Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 10/15/2024 | Pre-filed | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | First Reading Environment and Transportation |