Senate | 02/14/2025 | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment | ||
House | 02/13/2025 | Third Reading Passed (98-39) | ||
House | 02/11/2025 | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed | ||
House | 02/10/2025 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | ||
House | 01/10/2025 | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. | ||
House | 09/23/2024 | Pre-filed | ||
House | 01/08/2024 | First Reading Appropriations |